Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3625 Week
» 23918 Month
» 201822 Year
» 1867198 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7235 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77235 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90202 w/e 11/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25106
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/12/1948
38D   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 14/04/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 21/04/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 05/05/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/05/1951
41D   Canklow w/e 20/02/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK CLK Colwick on 28/01/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 02/02/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1947 General Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194702

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7235
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25106
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77235    
04/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90202    
14/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
05/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90202    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev