Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 844 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4357 Week
» 24650 Month
» 202554 Year
» 1867930 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7236 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77236 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3022 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63022 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90022 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25107
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Wed 31/10/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
51A   Darlington 4w/e 20/01/1951
51A   Darlington m/e 31/01/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/09/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
51L   Thornaby w/e 06/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 31/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 04/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 31/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7236
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25107
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77236    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3022    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63022 but not taken up    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90022    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
31/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90022    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev