Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 790 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4303 Week
» 24596 Month
» 202500 Year
» 1867876 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7237 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77237 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90203 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25108
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Sun 17/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
31B   March w/e 17/02/1952
31B   March 4w/e 22/03/1952
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
31B   March 4w/e 22/09/1956
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 16/03/1957
41F   Mexborough 4w/e 19/07/1958
41D   Canklow w/e 25/05/1963
36A   Doncaster w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 17/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill on 21/05/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 17/02/1952
ALLOC 31B March on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 5w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   on 17/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Stratton Park The following 'Austerity' 2-8-0 were noted at Stratton Park dump (a few miles on the London side of Swindon) on 17/8 awaiting works:-70829, 77141, 77237, 77368, 77394, 77399, 78621, 78624, 79254, 79273 and 79294, whilst 79303 was actually outside Swindon Works. SLS/194709
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102
10/12/1965 Doncaster MPD Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. SLS/196601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7237
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25108
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77237    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90203    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90203    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev