Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 311 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2012 Week
» 10127 Month
» 137570 Year
» 1802946 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7239 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77239 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90204 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25110
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/06/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/09/1951
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
27B   Aintree 4w/e 01/01/1955
10H   Lower Darwen w/e 03/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 19/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25G Farnley Junction w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 19/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7239
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25110
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77239    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90204    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
19/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90204    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev