Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7263 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 77263 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90346 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25134
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal Sun 24/10/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
NWE   New England w/e 13/08/1949
40B   Immingham 5w/e 22/09/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 14/06/1952
38A   Colwick 5w/e 21/06/1952
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 17/11/1956
16A   Toton w/e 21/12/1963
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 18/04/1964
9D   Newton Heath w/e 25/04/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 13/06/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 08/05/1965
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/06/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 09/10/1965
     Withdrawn on 24/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK HTN Heaton on 21/02/1947
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) on 20/04/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 22/09/1951
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 3w/e 01/12/1956
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
TOSTORE   w/e 14/08/1963
ALLOC 16A Toton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   on 24/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7263
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25134
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77263    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90346    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
08/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
24/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90346    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev