Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 12 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1922 Week
» 2861 Month
» 206351 Year
» 1871727 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7265 m/e 06/1944
War Dept. 77265 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3070 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63070 w/e 17/04/1948
British Railways 90070 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25136
To Service During 06/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 21/02/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1944
CLK   Colwick w/e 13/11/1948
NWE   New England w/e 04/12/1948
31B   March w/e 08/10/1950
31B   March 4w/e 21/10/1950
36C   Frodingham 5w/e 24/03/1951
36C   Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 21/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 24/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   w/e 21/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 24/02/1958 21/03/1958 26 days General    
Gorton Works 16/06/1961 07/08/1961 53 days Heavy Intermediate    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/04/1965 Doncaster Works (Stored) Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. SLS/196505
02/05/1965 Doncaster MPD (Shed stored) Shed stored: 63741, 90059/70/120/647. SLS/196506

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7265
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25136
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77265    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3070    
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63070    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90070    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
24/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958.    
16/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/06/1961. Dep: 07/08/1961.    
21/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90070    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev