|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 24/02/1958 | 21/03/1958 | 26 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1961 | 07/08/1961 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/04/1965 | Doncaster Works (Stored) | Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. | SLS/196505 |
02/05/1965 | Doncaster MPD (Shed stored) | Shed stored: 63741, 90059/70/120/647. | SLS/196506 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as WD Number 7265 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25136 |
||
01/1945 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 77265 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3070 | ||
17/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63070 | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
04/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90070 | ||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
21/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
24/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958. | ||
16/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/06/1961. Dep: 07/08/1961. | ||
21/02/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90070 | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |