Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 11 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1921 Week
» 2860 Month
» 206350 Year
» 1871726 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7270 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 77270 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90347 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25141
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal Wed 24/05/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
91M   To London Midland Region 3w/e 10/06/1950
91M   To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/06/1950
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 09/10/1965
50A   York (North) 4w/e 04/12/1965
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 08/10/1966
     Withdrawn on 24/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN BTN Brighton P 01/12/1947
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 27/05/1950
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 04/12/1965
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   on 24/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 W.D. \"8F\" Some of the W.D. '8F' class previously on loan to the Southern Region have gone to the L.M.R., including 90332, 90347, 90527, 90619, an 90655 to Huddersfield (25B). SLS/195008
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7270
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25141
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77270    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90347    
10/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
24/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90347    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev