Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 118 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4464 Week
» 4464 Month
» 71326 Year
» 1736702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7271 m/e 07/1944
War Dept. 77271 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90348 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25142
To Service During 07/1944
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1944
24A   Accrington 4w/e 19/04/1952
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 03/12/1955
56A   Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958
52G   Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 03/05/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 05/11/1966
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709
09/09/1967 Sunderland On the last day of steam working, Saturday, 9th September, 63395 worked to South Hetton and Dunston, 65894 to Vane Tempest Colliery and Dunston, 90348 to Dunston and Hylton Colliery and 90417 to South Hetton and Tyne Yard. 65894 had worked the last steam trips on the Silksworth branch on Friday, 8th September. (D2071/4 were booked for the Silksworth branch week commencing 11th September.) SLS/196710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7271
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25142
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77271    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90348    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90348    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev