Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 798 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2479 Week
» 22772 Month
» 200676 Year
» 1866052 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7272 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77272 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3075 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63075 w/e 27/11/1948
British Railways 90075 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25143
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
IMM   Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
31B   March w/e 08/10/1950
31B   March 4w/e 21/10/1950
38A   Colwick 4w/e 24/10/1953
34E   New England w/e 20/02/1960
40B   Immingham w/e 29/09/1962
36C   Frodingham w/e 11/09/1965
36A   Doncaster w/e 05/03/1966
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 29/12/1945
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 12/03/1966
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7272
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25143
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77272    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3075    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63075    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90075    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90075    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev