Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 794 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4307 Week
» 24600 Month
» 202504 Year
» 1867880 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7274 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77274 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90349 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25145
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 13/06/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 09/11/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 02/03/1947
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 25/11/1963
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/10/1965 Doncaster Shed (Stored) Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. SLS/196511
10/12/1965 Doncaster MPD Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. SLS/196601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7274
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25145
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77274    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90349    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90349    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev