Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 794 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2475 Week
» 22768 Month
» 200672 Year
» 1866048 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7276 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77276 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3076 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63076 w/e 24/07/1948
British Railways 90076 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25147
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
YK   York (North) w/e 12/02/1949
DAR   Darlington w/e 19/02/1949
51B   Newport (Teeside) m/e 30/06/1950
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
56A   Wakefield w/e 28/03/1959
55E   Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 12/08/1967
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/11/1945
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 19/02/1949
ALLOC 51B Newport (Teeside) m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 12/08/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7276
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25147
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77276    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3076    
24/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63076    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
19/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90076    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90076    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev