Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 828 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2509 Week
» 22802 Month
» 200706 Year
» 1866082 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7277 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77277 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3077 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63077 w/e 03/07/1948
British Railways 90077 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25148
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Mon 06/05/1963
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
65D   Dawsholm 8w/e 31/08/1957
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 02/08/1958
66E   Carstairs 4w/e 08/04/1961
61B   Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
     Withdrawn on 06/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 4w/e 08/04/1961
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   on 06/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
12/06/1963 Inverurie Works (Being scrapped) In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. SLS/196307

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7277
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25148
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77277    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3077    
03/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63077    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90077    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
08/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
06/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90077    
07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev