Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 7 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1917 Week
» 2856 Month
» 206346 Year
» 1871722 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7278 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77278 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90350 w/e 23/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25149
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Mon 22/08/1966
Service Life 22 yrs , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1966 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
     Withdrawn on 22/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK THJ Thornton Junction on 15/02/1947
WDN   on 22/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7278
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25149
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77278    
23/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90350    
22/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90350    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev