Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 20 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1930 Week
» 2869 Month
» 206359 Year
» 1871735 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7280 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77280 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90351 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25151
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Fri 22/09/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
56D   Mirfield w/e 20/06/1959
56F   Low Moor w/e 23/01/1960
56D   Mirfield w/e 12/09/1964
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 28/01/1967
55E   Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
     Withdrawn on 22/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 5w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 8w/e 25/02/1967
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   on 22/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
30/04/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 SLS/194806
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7280
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25151
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77280    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90351    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
22/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90351    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev