Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 788 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4301 Week
» 24594 Month
» 202498 Year
» 1867874 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7281 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77281 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3079 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63079 w/e 26/06/1948
British Railways 90079 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24952
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Fri 17/01/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
NWE   New England w/e 18/06/1949
31B   March 4w/e 23/01/1954
36A   Doncaster w/e 24/09/1960
36C   Frodingham w/e 18/11/1961
     Withdrawn on 17/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 29/11/1945
ALLOC NWE New England on 19/02/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 30/03/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 09/12/1961
WDN   on 17/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7281
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24952
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77281    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3079    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63079    
18/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90079    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
17/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90079    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev