Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 316 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2017 Week
» 10132 Month
» 137575 Year
» 1802951 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7284 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77284 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3080 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63080 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90080 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24955
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
9G   Gorton w/e 29/09/1962
8L   Aintree w/e 12/12/1964
9G   Gorton w/e 26/12/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 09/01/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 12/06/1965
36C   Frodingham w/e 01/01/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 13/03/1946
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 40E Colwick 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/02/1959 Rugby Works 42677(5A), 45256(8A), 45615/77, 48711 (8E), 73157(14D), 80082(1E), 92032(16D), 90080(2F). SLS/195903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7284
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24955
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77284    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3080    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63080 but not taken up    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90080    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
26/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90080    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev