Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 793 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6193 Week
» 24245 Month
» 257165 Year
» 1922541 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7286 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77286 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90354 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24957
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/10/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
75B   Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 11/08/1951
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 08/08/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 10/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN BTN Brighton P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 75B Redhill 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   w/e 10/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Brighton Works Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. SLS/194710
22/11/1949 Brighton Works On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7286
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24957
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77286    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90354    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
10/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90354    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev