Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 694 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1710 Week
» 19762 Month
» 252682 Year
» 1918058 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7288 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77288 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90355 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24959
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 15/07/1950
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/10/1955
81C   Southall m/e 16/06/1956
     Withdrawn on 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EXE Exeter m/e 31/03/1947
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   on 12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during February included: 2933, 2938, 2979, 2981, 3024, 3029, 3030, 3407, 3449, 3588, 4018, 4052, 4060, 4061, 4083, 4093, 4320, 5042, 5054, 5305, 5341, 5367, 6312, 6320, 6338, 6340, 6374, W.D. 70843, 77196, 77288, 78632, and 79234. Works' pilots during the same period included: 1796, 2044, and 2077. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are: 3758, 3789, 5760, 7777, 8776 and 9771. 2891 and 3804 have both been fitted with side windows, side sheets and doors between engine and tender sides. SLS/194704
31/03/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. SLS/194705
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7288
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24959
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77288    
15/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
03/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90355    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90355    

prev prev