Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 755 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 22729 Month
» 200633 Year
» 1866009 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7289 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77289 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90356 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24960
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/09/1953
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
81C   Southall 4w/e 25/01/1958
     Withdrawn on 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/03/1947
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   on 12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7289
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24960
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77289    
10/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90356    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90356    

prev prev