Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 755 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2436 Week
» 22729 Month
» 200633 Year
» 1866009 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7290 m/e 08/1944
War Dept. 77290 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3081 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63081 w/e 03/04/1948
British Railways 90081 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24961
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1944
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
50D   Goole w/e 31/08/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 03/12/1945
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/09/1963
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
25/03/1962 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) Erecting Shop: D4094 (Complete), D4158-60 (Engines in), D4161-5 (Frames), D15/30, D248/56, D2265, D3071, D3138, D3943, 46450, 60882/5, 60901/57, 61240/88, 63399, 63420/48/63/71, 65099, 90351, 92144/98, 92201. Stripping Shop: 46476, 60804, 65763. Stripping Shop Yard: 43117, 61013, 61256, 63360, 63443, 67752, 90068/81. Works Yard: D2113, D4091/2, D5174, 43129, 46460/7, 60816/55. 60954, 67609/61, 68024/35/64, 90333, 92097, 92194, Crossing: D2164, D2230, D2589, D3229/43. Test House: D4093, D5175. Scrap Yard: 61411/2/3/5/9/22/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/51/69, 67707/39/50/3/75, 68063, 68680/8/9, 68703/29/34 all complete with 60960/77, 61368, 67665/81 partially cut up. SLS/196205
09/09/1963 Thornaby MPD (in store) The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. SLS/196310
11/12/1966 Crewe Works (Paint shop) Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7290
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24961
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77290    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3081    
03/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63081    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90081    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90081    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev