Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 751 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2432 Week
» 22725 Month
» 200629 Year
» 1866005 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7292 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 77292 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90358 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24963
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Mon 25/11/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/12/1948
38D   Staveley (G.C.) on 29/10/1950
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/03/1951
38A   Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 14/02/1953
41D   Canklow w/e 05/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN GOR Gorton on 08/03/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 23/03/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) on 29/10/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   on 25/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7292
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24963
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77292    
04/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90358    
29/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
25/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90358    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev