Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 864 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4377 Week
» 24670 Month
» 202574 Year
» 1867950 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7294 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 77294 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90359 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24965
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/09/1964
Service Life 20 yrs , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 02/12/1950
26D   Bury 4w/e 04/10/1952
26B   Agecroft 8w/e 05/10/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 19/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NA Newton Abbot m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC LA Laira m/e 30/06/1947
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   w/e 19/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. SLS/194709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7294
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24965
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77294    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90359    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
19/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90359    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev