Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 863 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4376 Week
» 24669 Month
» 202573 Year
» 1867949 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7296 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 77296 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90360 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24967
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 23 yrs , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
RED   Redhill 9w/e 01/08/1948
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 11/08/1951
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 11/08/1956
56A   Wakefield w/e 14/09/1963
55E   Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 12/08/1967
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN AFD Ashford m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 56A Wakefield w/e 14/09/1963
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 12/08/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
21/09/1950 Brighton Works The Works were open to the public on Wednesday afternoon, 21st September, the special feature being the construction of the new 2-6-4T from the initial stages right up to the completed machine; No. 42103 was the exhibited finished product, in steam-to the delight of many boys who had to operate the hooter-while next to it was the Works Terrier, also in steam-so that many whistling competitions were in progress by the youthful fraternity. No. 42104 was outside, and ran trial trip during the afternoon. No. 42105 was being painted, 42106 well adanced, while 42066-42072 were in progress, the latter being a pair of frames not yet set up. 'B.o.B.' No. 34082 615 Squadron was also on view with facilities for footplate inspection as in the case of Nos. 42103 and 377S. Very few engines were under repair: 90360, 90254 and a Brighton C2x with 2-dome boiler and an I.3 tank. The partly erected 'Pacific' No. 34110 was also available, the boiler being mounted (temporarily at any rate) on the frames. SLS/195101
30/11/1950 Brighton Works Engines under repair include 680s, 30914 Eastbourne, 32082, 32106, 32449, 32482, and 77296/90360. New construction-42070-78 and 34110; the tanks are due out at the rate of one per week commencing with 42070 on 27/10 up to 42078 on 22/12. Addendum: The engines mentioned as under repair were all dealt with during November, and further tanks laid down up to 42084. SLS/195012
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7296
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24967
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77296    
01/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90360    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90360    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev