Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 853 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 22827 Month
» 200731 Year
» 1866107 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7298 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 77298 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3082 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63082 w/e 10/04/1948
British Railways 90082 on 17/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24969
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Sun 24/07/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
SKN   Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 14/06/1952
53C   Hull Springhead 5w/e 21/06/1952
50B   Neville Hill 5w/e 22/10/1955
51E   Stockton 4w/e 14/12/1957
51A   Darlington w/e 20/06/1959
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 16/03/1963
51A   Darlington w/e 29/06/1963
51L   Thornaby w/e 25/01/1964
51C   West Hartlepool w/e 23/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 24/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 24/11/1945
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 02/03/1963
LOAN 66A Polmadie 4w/e 06/03/1963
EXLOAN 51A Darlington 4w/e 06/07/1963
EXLOAN 91NE   5w/e 13/07/1963
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 08/02/1964
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   w/e 24/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7298
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24969
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77298    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3082    
10/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63082    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
17/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90082    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
24/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90082    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev