Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 14 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1924 Week
» 2863 Month
» 206353 Year
» 1871729 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7299 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 77299 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90362 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24970
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
25A   Wakefield (Reinstated) (Ex store on ER) w/e 18/06/1949
55E   Normanton 5w/e 20/07/1957
55G   Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 27/03/1965
55E   Normanton 4w/e 28/01/1967
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 27/03/1965
ALLOC 55E Normanton 8w/e 25/02/1967
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop Yard) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102
11/12/1966 Crewe Works (Paint shop) Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7299
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24970
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77299    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90362    
18/06/1949 Reinstated Reinstated to Wakefield (25A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
28/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90362    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev