Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 810 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2491 Week
» 22784 Month
» 200688 Year
» 1866064 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7300 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77300 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3003 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63003 w/e 30/10/1948
British Railways 90003 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24990
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Thu 25/06/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 22/07/1961
36A   Doncaster w/e 02/12/1961
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 09/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 25/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   on 25/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1947 Shakespeare Cliff There were 22 'Austerity' 2-8-0's on the sidings west of Shakespeare Cliff Tunnel on 3/1/47. and these included 77078, 77085, 77095, 77162, 77222, 77292, 77300, 77364, 77371, 77390, 77395, 78588, NS4320, NS4342, NS4364, NS4400, and six more, whose numbers could not be read. SLS/194702

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7300
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24990
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77300    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3003    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63003    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90003    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
25/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90003    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev