Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 825 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4338 Week
» 24631 Month
» 202535 Year
» 1867911 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7302 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77302 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90219 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25172
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/05/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
26D   Bury 4w/e 21/03/1953
27B   Aintree w/e 12/11/1960
24B   Rose Grove w/e 15/09/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 16/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 23/09/1947
LOAN 65F   on 22/05/1949
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 16/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/09/1947 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. SLS/194711
30/04/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7302
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25172
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77302    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90219    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
12/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
16/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90219    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev