Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7303 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77303 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90220 w/e 16/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25173
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/11/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
36A   Doncaster w/e 03/11/1951
35A   New England 4w/e 22/03/1952
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 19/04/1952
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
41D   Canklow w/e 25/05/1963
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 19/06/1965
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 24/02/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 23/03/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   on 19/05/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 14/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7303
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25173
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77303    
16/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90220    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90220    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev