Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 863 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4376 Week
» 24669 Month
» 202573 Year
» 1867949 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7305 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77305 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90221 w/e 25/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25175
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 31/01/1965
Service Life 21 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 31/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 31/07/1947
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 31/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7305
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25175
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77305    
25/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90221    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
31/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90221    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev