Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7306 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77306 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90222 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25186
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/08/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
26F   Patricroft w/e 27/02/1960
26B   Agecroft w/e 05/01/1963
10F   Rose Grove w/e 17/10/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 24/10/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 07/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 09/02/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 05/01/1963
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   In L.N.E.R. Shops   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710
27/08/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. SLS/194910
26/03/1966 Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7306
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25186
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77306    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90222    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
17/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
07/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90222    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev