Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 856 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4369 Week
» 24662 Month
» 202566 Year
» 1867942 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7307 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77307 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90223 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25187
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal During 03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
MEX   Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
40A   Lincoln 4w/e 29/12/1951
40B   Immingham 4w/e 18/04/1953
34E   New England w/e 21/02/1959
40A   Lincoln w/e 29/09/1962
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/09/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 03/1965
36C   Frodingham w/e 19/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill on 19/06/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 15/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/09/1963 Lincoln MPD The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7307
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25187
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77307    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90223    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90223    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev