Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 774 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14180 Week
» 67196 Month
» 186723 Year
» 3213576 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7307 |
m/e |
04/1943 |
War Dept. |
77307 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90223 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1963 |
Lincoln MPD |
The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7307 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25187 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77307 |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90223 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90223 |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |
|
|