Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 853 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 22827 Month
» 200731 Year
» 1866107 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7309 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77309 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90224 w/e 25/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25189
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal Tue 24/03/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 22/07/1961
36A   Doncaster w/e 02/12/1961
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 09/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 25/08/1947
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   on 24/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7309
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25189
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77309    
25/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90224    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
24/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90224    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev