Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 851 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2532 Week
» 22825 Month
» 200729 Year
» 1866105 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7310 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77310 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90225 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25190
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
87F   Llanelly w/e 31/12/1950
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 31/01/1951
82D   Westbury 4w/e 28/02/1951
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 16/06/1951
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 6w/e 30/06/1951
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 10/09/1960
41F   Mexborough on 02/12/1962
36A   Doncaster w/e 28/09/1963
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 16/01/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEA Neasden m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC LLY Llanelly m/e 30/09/1947
ALLOC 87F Llanelly w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 82D Westbury m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7310
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25190
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77310    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90225    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90225    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev