Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 13 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1923 Week
» 2862 Month
» 206352 Year
» 1871728 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7311 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77311 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90226 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25176
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/12/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 19/05/1951
26A   Newton Heath 8w/e 27/06/1951
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 06/10/1951
26A   Newton Heath w/e 27/10/1951
26D   Bury 4w/e 28/11/1953
26E   Lees (Oldham) w/e 14/11/1959
26D   Bury w/e 28/11/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 21/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   w/e 21/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1949 Brighton Works No. 36001, the first of the 'Leader' Class (0-6-6-0T) was outside the Works for the first time, in steam, on 21/6. The top casing was grey and the underframes and casings black. It is understood that this Class and also the new 'Battle of Britain' batch (34091 upwards) will normally be finished in lined black as for mixed traffic engines. The latest 2-8-0 repaired and re-numbered is No. 90718 (ex 79281). No. 2039 Hartland Point is in the repair shop, but its fate is uncertain: it is believed that the boiler is about worn out. Other engines recently shopped are Nos. 32488 (ex S2488), 90107 (ex 77007), 90678 (ex 79210), 32083 (plain black-so far), 90226 (ex 77311), 32536. 32576. SLS/194907
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In yard) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108
20/05/1951 Locos renumbered S.R. 2170 was renumbered 32170 in mid-May, and diesel sl will shortly be turned out as 15201. Thus the S.R. diesels have become 15201-15203 instead of 15200-15202 as originally ordained. The Southern Region has lost two more W.D., 2-8-0 to the L.M.R., 90226 from 73B and 90390 from 73C. No. 77150 has now become 90142, so that all remaining on the S.R. are now renumbered with the possible exception of 77226 (90194). SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7311
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25176
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77311    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90226    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
27/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
21/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90226    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev