Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 854 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4367 Week
» 24660 Month
» 202564 Year
» 1867940 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7312 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77312 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90227 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25177
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/09/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 27/02/1954
8D   Widnes w/e 25/07/1959
6B   Mold Junction w/e 15/08/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/04/1962
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 22/09/1962
26D   Bury w/e 16/03/1963
26C   Bolton w/e 18/05/1963
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 12/09/1964
41H   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 16/01/1965
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STM St Margarets on 26/09/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove on 11/03/1949
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/09/1947 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. SLS/194711
15/11/1947 Eastfield MPD On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. SLS/194802

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7312
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25177
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77312    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90227    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
28/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
26/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90227    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev