Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 806 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2487 Week
» 22780 Month
» 200684 Year
» 1866060 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7313 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77313 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90228 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25178
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal Mon 02/09/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
68A     on 19/06/1949
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 16/07/1949
25C   Goole on 01/07/1950
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 11/08/1947
ALLOC 68A   on 19/06/1949
ALLOC 25C Goole on 01/07/1950
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 01/07/1950
WDN   on 02/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1947 Eastfield MPD On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. SLS/194802
01/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7313
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25178
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77313    
19/06/1949 Allocation      
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90228    
01/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
02/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90228    

prev prev