Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 843 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2524 Week
» 22817 Month
» 200721 Year
» 1866097 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7314 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77314 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90229 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25179
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
62C   Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 06/07/1963
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 02/05/1947
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 13/07/1963
WDN   on 02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7314
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25179
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77314    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90229    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90229    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev