Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 805 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4318 Week
» 24611 Month
» 202515 Year
» 1867891 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7315 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77315 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90230 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25180
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal Wed 24/05/1967
Service Life 24 yrs , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
50B   Neville Hill 4w/e 14/12/1957
50A   York (North) 5w/e 14/06/1958
56A   Wakefield w/e 07/11/1959
56B   Ardsley w/e 26/08/1961
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 06/11/1965
     Withdrawn on 24/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 18/03/1947
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   on 24/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7315
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25180
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77315    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90230    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
24/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90230    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev