Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 840 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2521 Week
» 22814 Month
» 200718 Year
» 1866094 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7316 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77316 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3006 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63006 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90006 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25181
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal Mon 02/09/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/07/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates m/e 12/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK YK York (North) on 12/03/1946
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
WDN   on 02/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7316
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25181
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77316    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3006    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63006 but not taken up    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90006    
23/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
02/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90006    

prev prev