Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 850 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4363 Week
» 24656 Month
» 202560 Year
» 1867936 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7318 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77318 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3007 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63007 w/e 30/10/1948
British Railways 90007 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25183
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/07/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
HLS   Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1950
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 30/06/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 21/10/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 16/02/1952
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 13/12/1952
38A   Colwick 5w/e 17/01/1953
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 21/01/1956
36C   Frodingham w/e 06/02/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 06/03/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 06/04/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 16/02/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
LOAN 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 27/12/1952
LOAN 38A Colwick 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7318
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25183
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77318    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3007    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63007    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90007    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
24/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90007    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev