Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 272 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1973 Week
» 10088 Month
» 137531 Year
» 1802907 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7321 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77321 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90234 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25191
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Fri 29/11/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
27B   Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/08/1951
27B   Aintree m/e 16/06/1956
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 13/04/1957
65F   Grangemouth 4w/e 11/08/1962
     Withdrawn on 29/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 6w/e 18/08/1962
WDN   on 29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/03/1950 Brighton Works Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. SLS/195004
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7321
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25191
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77321    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90234    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
13/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
29/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90234    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev