Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 834 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2515 Week
» 22808 Month
» 200712 Year
» 1866088 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7323 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77323 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90235 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25193
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
YK   York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 13/10/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/10/1951
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 16/02/1952
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 23/02/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
36A   Doncaster w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK CLK Colwick on 20/02/1947
ALLOC BRN Barnsley on 27/04/1947
ALLOC LA Laira m/e 31/08/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 05/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 16/02/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
10/10/1965 Doncaster Shed (Stored) Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. SLS/196511

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7323
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25193
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77323    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90235    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
13/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90235    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev