Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 644 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1660 Week
» 19712 Month
» 252632 Year
» 1918008 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7324 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77324 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90236 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25194
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
25A   Wakefield w/e 01/09/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 08/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath m/e 16/06/1956
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 11/08/1956
50A   York (North) 5w/e 14/06/1958
56A   Wakefield w/e 07/11/1959
56F   Low Moor w/e 14/11/1959
56D   Mirfield w/e 16/09/1961
56B   Ardsley w/e 07/07/1962
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 06/11/1965
55E   Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
     Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 09/08/1947
LOAN 65F   on 22/05/1949
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 3w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 06/11/1965
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 15/07/1967
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7324
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25194
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77324    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90236    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90236    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev