Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 841 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4354 Week
» 24647 Month
» 202551 Year
» 1867927 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7325 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77325 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90237 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25195
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/01/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
25C   Goole w/e 13/10/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 01/12/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 27/02/1954
2F   Market Harborough 4w/e 22/03/1958
16A   Toton w/e 21/12/1963
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 25/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 25/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/04/1947
LOAN 25A Wakefield on 03/10/1949
ALLOC 25C Goole w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield 4w/e 01/12/1951
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 16A Toton 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 25/01/1964
ALLOC 1G Woodford Halse 3w/e 01/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. SLS/194808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7325
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25195
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77325    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90237    
13/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
25/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90237    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev