Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 789 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2470 Week
» 22763 Month
» 200667 Year
» 1866043 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7326 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77326 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90238 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25196
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/03/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
86C   Cardiff Canton m/e 31/10/1951
18B   Westhouses w/e 18/07/1959
9G   Gorton w/e 23/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 16/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 31/12/1946
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 18B Westhouses on 12/07/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1959
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 16/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 SLS/194701
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
09/08/1958 Cardiff Canton MPD - stored locomotives 2805/16/27, 90238/524. SLS/195810
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7326
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25196
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77326    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90238    
31/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
16/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90238    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev