Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 824 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2505 Week
» 22798 Month
» 200702 Year
» 1866078 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7327 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77327 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90239 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25197
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Mon 25/11/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
NWE   New England w/e 12/11/1949
36C   Frodingham w/e 29/09/1962
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK HTN Heaton on 11/04/1947
ALLOC MAR March on 15/07/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   on 25/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7327
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25197
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77327    
12/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90239    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
25/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90239    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev