Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 788 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4301 Week
» 24594 Month
» 202498 Year
» 1867874 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7328 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77328 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90240 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25198
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Mon 09/01/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
51B   Newport (Teeside) 4w/e 14/12/1957
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
56B   Ardsley w/e 23/06/1962
50B   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 06/11/1965
     Withdrawn on 09/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 28/06/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947
ALLOC 51B Newport (Teeside) 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   on 09/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7328
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25198
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77328    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90240    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
09/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90240    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev