Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 16 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1926 Week
» 2865 Month
» 206355 Year
» 1871731 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7332 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77332 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90243 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25200
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse m/e 16/06/1956
55C   Farnley Junction w/e 25/04/1959
55D   Royston w/e 20/06/1959
55E   Normanton w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 55C Farnley Junction 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 55E Normanton 5w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710
04/07/1964 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. SLS/196408
11/12/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. SLS/196701
08/01/1967 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop-60007/10, 70013, 92220, D293, D388, D1505/7/23/92, D1622/30, D1728/56/74/81/91/7/8, D1805/37, D5711, D8005/43, E3001/2/14/6/22/3/6/9/45/6/68, E3100/99, E5023, E5015(E6101), E5016 (E6102), E5006(E6103). Old Paint shop-D249, D1102/9/10/1/5/94, D5709, D8061, E3064, E5019, 92009. Side of Works-D5710/3, 90243/81. Traverser area-D233, D1525, D1619, D1751, D1977, D5715, D8017, 60026, 71000. New shop-D251, D284, D332, D346, D364, D366, D1513/68/79, D1617, D1750, D1925/43. Electric shop-E3171, E26050. New Paint shop: D1621/9, D1758/77. No sign of E5024-the conversions appear to be having completely new bodies apart from cabs and are somewhat lengthened in appearance. SLS/196702
19/02/1967 Crewe Works (Old paint shop area) Erecting shop-D1506/9/17, D1605/26/33/98, D1744/54/65/70/94/9, D1802, E3002/13/26/45/6/68/70/1, E3131/52/63/99, D213/81/2, D382, D8054, E5003, E6101/2/3/4/5, E26018/25. Traverser Area-D1501/5/12/5/88, 60026, 71000, E3025/79, D385, D8003. New shop-D390, D1514/8/9/73/89, D1635/94, D1736/53/9, D1851, D1948, D8123/38 (damaged). New paint shop-60007/10, 92220. Old paint shop area-90243/81, E26033, D378, D1596, D1852, D8048, E3016/105. SLS/196704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7332
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25200
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77332    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90243    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
25/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90243    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev